THE BUZZACOTT STUART DEFRIES MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1100855
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 September 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 06 September 2021 38 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 25 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 11 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 20 July 2017 On time Download