INDIA DIRECT

Charity number: 1101839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £80.26k £128.41k £68.09k £86.58k £66.98k
Total expenditure £81.41k £113.49k £71.83k £72.27k £72.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A