Bolton Community Furniture Store Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Protecting the environment by collecting reusable household goods which would otherwise go to waste in order to assist people experiencing poverty in the UK through the provision of a home furniture and electrical goods service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £76,884 from 1 government contract(s) and £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
Governance
- 31 December 2003: Standard registration
- BCT & FS (Working name)
- BOLTON COMMUNITY TRANSPORT AND FURNITURE SERVICES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanne Marie Kelly | Chair | 26 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Steven Lyons | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WRAY WALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £342.74k | £300.30k | £333.83k | £373.65k | £421.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £373.03k | £308.27k | £297.56k | £332.45k | £408.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £26.65k | £83.56k | £75.08k | £76.88k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £14.66k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/04/2014 as amended on 05 Apr 2022 as amended on 05 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, BY COLLECTING REUSABLE HOUSEHOLD GOODS WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE GO TO WASTE AND PROVIDING SUCH ITEMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES IN THE UK, IN PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE IN GREATER MANCHESTER.
Area of benefit
UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit A1
Lecturers Close
Bolton
BL3 6DG
- Phone:
- 01204 364777
- Email:
- admin@bcfs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window