Accounts and annual returns ZEDOKO VOCHESSED LTD

Charity number: 1101369
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 26 June 2022 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 26 June 2022 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 September 2021 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 September 2021 137 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 September 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 10 September 2020 133 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 June 2019 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 June 2019 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 17 September 2018 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 17 September 2018 140 days late Download Open in new window