Financial history ZEDOKO VOCHESSED LTD

Charity number: 1101369
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £147.61k £400.09k £240.21k £141.35k £176.64k
Total expenditure £22.35k £53.57k £69.98k £75.69k £133.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A