TOGETHER IN WEST ESSEX

Charity number: 1105575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 September 2017 On time Download