Financial history THE QUEEN'S COLLEGE, OXFORD

Charity number: 1142553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £15.36m £17.54m £15.14m £16.07m £11.44m
Total expenditure £11.07m £11.59m £13.52m £13.35m £14.10m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.63m £6.05m £3.35m £5.12m £2.09m
Income - Other trading activities £686.00k £596.00k £672.00k £284.00k £27.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.77m £5.12m £4.97m £4.37m £4.35m
Income - Endowments £3.58m £3.33m £3.19m £4.99m £1.97m
Income - Investment £5.27m £5.77m £6.14m £5.92m £4.68m
Income - Other £2.00k £0 £0 £371.00k £304.00k
Income - Legacies £815.00k £1.54m £2.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.15m £9.72m £11.52m £11.41m £12.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.91m £1.88m £1.56m £1.95m £1.51m
Expenditure - Governance £20.00k £18.00k £20.00k £20.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.41m £1.35m £1.44m £1.41m £1.27m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £444.00k £0 £0