Financial history UK BIOBANK LIMITED

Charity number: 1101332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £12.90m £21.37m £44.72m £35.19m £62.73m
Total expenditure £17.78m £17.62m £42.51m £39.17m £63.62m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £325.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £16.43m £37.49m £21.48m £6.62m
Income - Other trading activities £2.42m £3.21m £4.04m £3.77m £10.12m
Income - Charitable activities £701.19k £1.06m £2.23m £2.21m £2.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.39k £28.34k £81.97k £59.80k £4.79k
Income - Other £9.76m £633.00k £873.84k £7.68m £43.39m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.90m £14.14m £37.68m £28.26m £31.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £82.44k £94.65k £97.50k £73.31k £85.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.88m £3.48m £4.82m £10.92m £31.64m