Trustees UK BIOBANK LIMITED
Charity number: 1101332

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Ajay Kumar Kakkar | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Nicola Perrin | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Sir Michael Ferguson | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Dame Nancy Jane Rothwell | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Doug Gurr | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tariq Khokhar | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Dominic Dodd | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
PROFESSOR ANNEKE LUCASSEN | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR SIR ALEX MARKHAM | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Professor Martin Bobrow | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Joseph McNamara | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.