Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE MINSTER ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1102463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window