HAJJ APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance to support the performance of Hajj along with giving aid to other needy charities and causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALEEM KHATTAK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.59k | £2.95k | £3.29k | £3.62k | £3.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FOSTERING AND PROMOTING THE PERFORMANCE OF HAJJ AND UMRAH AND IN PARTICULAR TO ASSIST FINANCIALLY AND PRACTICALLY THOSE PERSONS WISHING TO PERFORM PILGRIMAGE WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE PREVENTED FROM DOING SO BECAUSE OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 ETON HILL ROAD
RADCLIFFE
MANCHESTER
M26 2XT
- Phone:
- 01617235489
- Email:
- enquiries@hajjappeal.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window