BARUGH GREEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
Total income includes £8,033 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
Governance
- 12 January 2004: Standard registration
- BARUGH GREEN PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M WRIGHT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Diane Gillespie | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Gillespie | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rodgers | Trustee | 30 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Standhaven | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Royce | Trustee | 08 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carol Dyson | Trustee | 01 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.52k | £97.42k | £103.17k | £99.77k | £113.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.28k | £117.30k | £108.25k | £94.56k | £98.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £14.78k | £8.03k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 351 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 351 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 717 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 717 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 31ST JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BARNSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARUGH GREEN VILLAGE HALL
BARUGH GREEN ROAD
BARUGH GREEN
BARNSLEY
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
S75 1JT
- Phone:
- 01226390810
- Email:
- bgps2022@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window