Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS' OF THE CHURCH OF ST HELEN'S BOULTHAM

Charity number: 1100944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 November 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 November 2020 393 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 November 2020 757 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 November 2020 1122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required