Financial history FRIENDS' OF THE CHURCH OF ST HELEN'S BOULTHAM

Charity number: 1100944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £648 £1.19k £2.25k £1.11k £56
Total expenditure £68 £2.06k £4.65k £3.79k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A