THE FULLERS MILL TRUST

Charity number: 1106265
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2297 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2297 days
Annual return 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2662 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2662 days
Annual return 31 March 2012 30 November 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 30 November 2012 On time
Annual return 31 March 2011 19 December 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 19 December 2011 On time
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On time