THE FULLERS MILL TRUST

Charity number: 1106265
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £9.00k £135.35k £135.35k £204.99k £279.14k
Total expenditure £6.56k £17.31k £34.22k £61.00k £86.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A