Accounts and annual returns DEDDINGTON WINDMILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1101528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 16 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 07 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 27 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 24 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 20 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 23 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window