ZINDAGI TRUST UK

Charity number: 1101700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 August 2020 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 September 2019 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2018 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required