Financial history THE BROOMHILL POOL TRUST

Charity number: 1102659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £732 £1.24k £3.16k £1.55k £529
Total expenditure £800 £594 £1.21k £378 £1.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A