Financial history WORD FOUNTAIN CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1102347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £71.24k £76.00k £59.49k £73.55k £73.35k
Total expenditure £61.18k £60.86k £61.06k £67.98k £52.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A