Financial history FRIENDS OF LOIS WEEDON CHURCH

Charity number: 1101357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £4.61k £5.40k £3.16k £2.93k £5.39k
Total expenditure £5.06k £720 £120 £3.80k £141
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A