Financial history BCR GJAG LTD

Charity number: 1101438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.33m £1.38m £1.54m £1.40m £1.27m
Total expenditure £1.23m £1.22m £1.38m £1.28m £1.14m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £75.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £721.28k £753.56k £790.80k £833.39k £799.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8 £1 £45 £133 £2
Income - Other £612.37k £629.67k £751.19k £568.53k £467.28k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.22m £1.38m £1.28m £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.50k £1.20k £540 £7.85k £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £6.60k £6.75k £11.25k £11.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0