Accounts and annual returns PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF PLYMOUTH COLLEGE PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1102021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 08 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required