Financial history PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF PLYMOUTH COLLEGE PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1102021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £20.38k £15.77k £28.24k £11.89k £3.24k
Total expenditure £16.06k £14.63k £27.35k £12.31k £3.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A