IVORIAN DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1106968
Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £6.32k £12.56k £5.06k £5.10k £8.10k
Total expenditure £5.97k £9.90k £4.14k £4.90k £6.80k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A