Trustees CLEETHORPES CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1102007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Cooper Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Carra Wray Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Laura Hammond Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
Lorna Pendred Trustee 16 January 2018
None on record
Clive Moore Trustee 09 November 2017
None on record