Friends of Calmore Infant School

Charity number: 1102133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 October 2021 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 October 2021 473 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 July 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required