ROYAL LIVERPOOL PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY'S SPECIAL ACTIVITIES FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity is dormant
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 2004: Standard registration
- THE KENNETH STERN MEMORIAL FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF ROBERT SELLS | Trustee | 27 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROF JOHN WILLIAM LAST CBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUISE SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 OCTOBER 1977.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS UPON (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR) THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES THAT IS TO SAY: (1) THE PROMOTION OF MUSIC TO BE PERFORMED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ROYAL LIVERPOOL PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA (2) THE PROMOTION OF MUSIC OR MUSICAL ACTIVITIES TO BE PROMOTED OR SPONSORED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ROYAL LIVERPOOL PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY EITHER ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH ANY OTHER PERSON BODY CORPORATE OR BODIES CORPORATE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC MAINLY IN THE MERSEYSIDE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL LIVERPOOL PHILHARMONIC SOCIET
PHILHARMONIC HALL
HOPE STREET
LIVERPOOL
L1 9BP
- Phone:
- 01512102895
- Email:
- accounts@liverpoolphil.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window