Trustees CARRS LANE COUNSELLING CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1102628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Charles Horwood | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jonathan Leo | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
DILIP PUJARA | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Chimene Codner | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MARY COTTINGHAM | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HARRIS | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH BARBARA CUMMINGS | Trustee | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.