Accounts and annual returns CAMPAIGN FOR BETTER TRANSPORT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1101929
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window