BEXHILL COMMUNITY BUS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates a community bus service in areas where commercial operators will not do so.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 29 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Moira Langlands | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Anthony Robert Loftus | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ANN WARCUP | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN SMALE | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Everiss | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Hardie | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Drayson | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||
John Pacitti | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lindsay Hymans | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.90k | £45.87k | £43.00k | £42.75k | £53.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.73k | £53.12k | £55.17k | £50.08k | £36.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 13 MAY 2004 AND 9 JULY 2004. as amended on 08 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEXHILL AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR POVERTY OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BEXHILL AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2
Beeching Cose
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN39 3YF
- Phone:
- 01424222820
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window