Financial history MARY EXTON SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1101159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £11.16k £9.53k £11.42k £7.55k £3.31k
Total expenditure £15.53k £2.07k £14.57k £14.34k £337
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A