LONDON INTERNATIONAL ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1104133
Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 185 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 185 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 February 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 February 2020 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time Download