THE BATTERSEA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1103560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Oughton Trustee 19 March 2020 None on record
Carol Rahn Trustee 21 March 2019
RSPCA Wimbledon, Wandsworth and Sutton District Branch Received: On time
Sue Marshall Trustee 09 March 2017 None on record
Ian Beardall Trustee 24 March 2015 None on record
Dr Susan Demont Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record
Sue Demont Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record
Jenny Sheridan Chair 10 March 2016 None on record
Duncan Parish Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
Dr Clare Graham Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
SARA MILNE Trustee None on record
Michael Jubb Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record