Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN ACADEMY OF OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH PSYCHOLOGY

Charity number: 1115640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2021 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 April 2021 532 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 September 2021 683 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required