Financial history EUROPEAN ACADEMY OF OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH PSYCHOLOGY

Charity number: 1115640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.70k £215.35k £14.58k £79.89k £1.63k
Total expenditure £27.73k £120.30k £43.48k £58.30k £8.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A