ROCHDALE DA'WAH CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity continues to be: *The education of the public on Islamic principles and values through the sale and distribution of Islamic material, and by organising study groups, lectures and one-to-one counseling sessions, and *The organising of social activities and sporting events that facilitate an Islamic learning environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rochdale
Governance
- 09 June 2004: Standard registration
- 13 October 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 13 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1078488 MUSLIM CHARITY HELPING THE NEEDY
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.94k | £23.46k | £18.26k | £14.09k | £15.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.21k | £21.29k | £18.52k | £20.16k | £55.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 08 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 23 April 2019 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 24 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 MAY 2004.
Charitable objects
(I) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON ISLAMIC PRINCIPLES AND VALUES THROUGH THE SALE AND DISTRIBUTION OF ISLAMIC MATERIAL, AND BY ORGANISING STUDY GROUPS, LECTURES AND ONE-TO-ONE COUNSELLING SESSIONS (II) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCALLY IN THE ROCHDALE AREA OF GREATER MANCHESTER, LANCASHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window