Trustees THAMES21 LIMITED
Charity number: 1103997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN HAMILTON | Chair | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Sarah Riggs | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Littleton | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Emma Wood | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fabian Sheedy | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michelle Yaa Asantewa | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Anthony White | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stratton McMMurtrie | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wayne Baggs | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Green | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robin John David Mortimer | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY LOUISE MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD TIMOTHY DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.