Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST OSWALD'S

Charity number: 1103270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 October 2021 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 October 2021 620 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2021 985 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 October 2021 1349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required