Financial history ST ALBANS CITY BAND

Charity number: 1102355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.12k £7.88k £21.50k £10.64k £20.91k
Total expenditure £13.98k £29.39k £21.50k £10.64k £15.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A