ACTIVITY CLUB FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS (BERKSHIRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a Holiday Club environment during Easter and Summer school holidays for children with additional needs and disabilities between the ages of 3 and 19. We also provide an After School Club at Addington School, Woodley, Monday through Friday during Term Time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 28 May 2004: Standard registration
- THE THUMBS UP CLUB (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Moody | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Melian Hulley | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Lauren Sidorowicz | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reama Shearman | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Perkins | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mackenzie | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.34k | £156.88k | £136.89k | £136.89k | £127.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.31k | £105.87k | £131.49k | £131.49k | £139.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | £35.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 21 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDED THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THEIR SIBLINGS OUTSIDE OF SCHOOL HOURS; AND (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BERKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Addington School
Woodlands Avenue
Woodley
READING
RG5 3EU
- Phone:
- 07974693736
- Email:
- finance@thumbsupclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window