Financial history THE TREDEGAR HOUSE FOLK FESTIVAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1103628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £18.09k £20.17k £26.29k £2.96k £198
Total expenditure £18.99k £19.25k £26.01k £2.55k £130
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k N/A N/A