Accounts and annual returns MAKER WITH RAME COMMUNITY BUS SERVICE

Charity number: 1103104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 05 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 07 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required