Trustees MAKER WITH RAME COMMUNITY BUS SERVICE

Charity number: 1103104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLE AMPHLETT Chair 01 July 2015
None on record
Fleur Young Trustee 25 February 2022
None on record
Gillian Ann Bunnell Trustee 25 February 2022
None on record
CATHE MAYHEW Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
BARBARA ELIZABETH SARAH RADLEY Trustee 08 November 2017
None on record
CAROLYN WENDY PAPE Trustee 08 November 2017
None on record
JOHN SAWLE Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
CAROLE INGRID SATTERTHWAITE Trustee
None on record
CATHERINE ANN MAYHEW Trustee
None on record
SHEILA WEETMAN Trustee
None on record