Accounts and annual returns THE KOUDMEN EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1103403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required