THE CHURCH OF THE LIVING GOD OF THE APOSTOLIC FAITH

Charity number: 1114152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 April 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 April 2021 428 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 April 2021 793 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 March 2017 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required