THE CHURCH OF THE LIVING GOD OF THE APOSTOLIC FAITH

Charity number: 1114152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.66k £9.17k £7.19k £6.34k £3.36k
Total expenditure £1.38k £2.54k £6.37k £5.56k £6.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A