AFRICAN WOMEN EMPOWERMENT AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1102744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 February 2020 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 February 2017 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 14 February 2017 14 days late Download