AFRICAN WOMEN EMPOWERMENT AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1102744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.21k £27.01k £42.13k £25.24k £53.85k
Total expenditure £19.21k £21.82k £37.53k £18.34k £45.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A