Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH ALDBOURNE

Charity number: 1102788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required